OH HB105 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-17)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
Pending: Senate Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
Pending: Senate Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.221, 3313.60, and 3319.073 and to enact sections 3314.0310 and 3326.091 of the Revised Code with respect to developmentally appropriate student instruction in child sexual abuse and sexual violence prevention and in-service staff training in child sexual abuse prevention.
Title
Regards age-appropriate child sexual abuse instruction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2021-06-10 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported - Amended: Primary and Secondary Education |
2021-02-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 01 | 221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 0310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 19 | 073 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |