OH HB104 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-12)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5739.121 of the Revised Code to allow vendors to receive a refund of sales tax remitted for bad debts on private label credit accounts when the debt is charged off as uncollectible by the credit account lender.
Title
Allow vendors to receive sales tax refunds for certain bad debts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported - Amended: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development |
2017-03-07 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |