OH HB102 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Re-referred: Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5162.06 and to enact sections 5164.061 and 5167.15 of the Revised Code regarding Medicaid coverage of chiropractic services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards Medicaid coverage of chiropractic services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseRe-referred: Insurance
2020-05-20HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2019-03-05HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5162Amended CodeCitation Text
516206Amended CodeCitation Text
5164New CodeSee Bill Text
5164061New CodeSee Bill Text
5167New CodeSee Bill Text
516715New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback