OH HB101 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-15)
Status: Engrossed on October 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 307.01, 307.021, 2301.51, and 5120.10 and to enact sections 342.01, 342.02, 342.03, 342.04, 342.05, 342.06, 342.07, 342.08, 342.09, 342.10, 342.11, 342.12, 342.13, 342.14, 342.15, 342.16, and 5705.234 of the Revised Code to establish new processes for funding the construction, acquisition, improvement, operation, and maintenance of jail facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards funding jail construction / maintenance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-20SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-10-19SenateIntroduced
2021-10-13HousePassed
2021-10-13HouseReported - Substitute: Infrastructure and Rural Development
2021-02-17HouseRefer to Committee: Infrastructure and Rural Development
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230151Amended CodeCitation Text
30701Amended CodeCitation Text
307021Amended CodeCitation Text
34201New CodeSee Bill Text
34202New CodeSee Bill Text
34203New CodeSee Bill Text
34204New CodeSee Bill Text
34205New CodeSee Bill Text
34206New CodeSee Bill Text
34207New CodeSee Bill Text
34208New CodeSee Bill Text
34209New CodeSee Bill Text
34210New CodeSee Bill Text
34211New CodeSee Bill Text
34212New CodeSee Bill Text
34213New CodeSee Bill Text
34214New CodeSee Bill Text
34215New CodeSee Bill Text
34216New CodeSee Bill Text
512010Amended CodeCitation Text
5705234New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-101
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb101/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb101/RH/01/hb101_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb101/PH/02/hb101_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15730&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15839&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17439&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17471&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17470&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17565&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17564&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17568&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18154&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-101

Bill Comments

feedback