OH HB101 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 56-18)
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3728.03, 4729.16, 4729.23, 4729.28, 4729.41, 4729.43, 4729.45, 4729.553, 4729.99, and 4731.96 and to enact sections 3707.60, 4729.382, 4729.47, and 4731.961 of the Revised Code to establish provisions to be known as the "Epinephrine Accessibility Act" and to make other changes to the laws governing the State Board of Pharmacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improve access to epinephrine

Sponsors

Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. John Becker [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Sen. Niraj Antani [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Thomas Brinkman [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]
Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Rep. Candice Keller [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2018-12-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-27HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-27SenatePassed
2018-12-21SenateInformally passed
2018-12-19SenateInformally passed
2018-11-28SenateReported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-05-17SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2017-05-11SenateIntroduced
2017-05-10HousePassed
2017-05-03HouseReported - Amended: Health
2017-03-07HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37New CodeSee Bill Text
3707New CodeSee Bill Text
370760New CodeSee Bill Text
3728Amended CodeCitation Text
372803Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4729Amended CodeCitation Text
472916Amended CodeCitation Text
472923Amended CodeCitation Text
472928Amended CodeCitation Text
4729382New CodeSee Bill Text
472941Amended CodeCitation Text
472943Amended CodeCitation Text
472945Amended CodeCitation Text
472946New CodeSee Bill Text
472947New CodeSee Bill Text
4729553Amended CodeCitation Text
472999Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
473196Amended CodeCitation Text
4731961New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback