OH HB10 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 107.64 of the Revised Code to establish the Governor's Office of Drug Policy and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Governor's Office of Drug Policy

Sponsors

Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Candice Keller [R]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]
Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]

Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HousePassed - Amended
2019-06-11HouseReported - Amended: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-06-05HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2019-05-21HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-05-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
107New CodeSee Bill Text
10764New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback