NY S05172 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the unlawful tampering of farm animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the unlawful tampering of farm animals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
2011-06-24SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2011-06-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2011-06-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2011-06-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.938
2011-05-03SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback