NY S50324 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-23 - PASSED SENATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Schoharie to impose hotel and motel taxes not to exceed four percent of the per diem rental rate; permits such revenues to be used to promote tourism and other forms of business in the county.
Title
Authorizes the county of Schoharie to impose hotel and motel taxes not to exceed four percent of the per diem rental rate; permits such revenues to be used to promote tourism and other forms of business in the county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-23 | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE | |
2009-06-23 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.13 | |
2009-06-23 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
S1073 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.101
A4718 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.101
S64323 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65034 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES
A4718 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.101
S64323 (Same As) 2009-06-28 - REFERRED TO RULES
S65034 (Same As) 2009-06-29 - REFERRED TO RULES