NY S09829 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to continuance of the Greenburgh North Castle Union Free School District number 12.
Title
Relates to continuance of the Greenburgh North Castle Union Free School District number 12.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.179 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.521 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a10532 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1873 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10532 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s9829