NY S09547 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption from requirements for the alienation of parkland for renewable energy generating projects in the county of Westchester with a generating capacity not exceeding two megawatts and which are located above real property that was established and used for vehicle parking.
Title
Provides an exemption from requirements for the alienation of parkland for renewable energy generating projects in the county of Westchester with a generating capacity not exceeding two megawatts and which are located above real property that was established and used for vehicle parking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1537 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9547A |
2024-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10226 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - print number 10226a