NY S09546 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 20 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the purposes and duties of the Mount Kisco firefighter's benevolent association and the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes.
Title
Relates to the purposes and duties of the Mount Kisco firefighter's benevolent association and the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.294 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10273 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1536 |
2024-05-28 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10273 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - substituted by s9546