NY S09478 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for compensation and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; authorizes funding of joint labor-management committees; implements agreements between the state and an employee organization; makes an appropriation therefor (Part A); provides for the salaries of certain state officers and employees excluded from collective negotiating units; makes an appropriation therefor (Part B).
Title
Provides for compensation and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; authorizes funding of joint labor-management committees; implements agreements between the state and an employee organization; makes an appropriation therefor (Part A); provides for the salaries of certain state officers and employees excluded from collective negotiating units; makes an appropriation therefor (Part B).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.361 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.768 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10526 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1921 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10526 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9478