NY S09446 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Subtracts from the federal adjusted gross income any income earned by election inspectors, poll clerks, or election coordinators earned while working in relation to a general, primary, run-off primary, or special election to the extent includable in gross income for federal tax purposes; exempts such income from being included in the calculation of the amount of benefits under public assistance programs.
Title
Subtracts from the federal adjusted gross income any income earned by election inspectors, poll clerks, or election coordinators earned while working in relation to a general, primary, run-off primary, or special election to the extent includable in gross income for federal tax purposes; exempts such income from being included in the calculation of the amount of benefits under public assistance programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1738 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A10463 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - referred to ways and means