NY S09445 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the performance of surgical devocalization procedures on dogs and cats.
Title
Restricts the performance of surgical devocalization procedures on dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1737 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A10548 (Same As) 2022-07-06 - referred to agriculture