NY S09427 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to disclose compensation or range of compensation to applicants and employees upon issuing an employment opportunity for internal or public viewing or upon employee request.
Title
Requires employers to disclose compensation or range of compensation to applicants and employees upon issuing an employment opportunity for internal or public viewing or upon employee request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.45 |
2022-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.723 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.653 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10477 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1735 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9427A |
2022-05-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2022-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A10477 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9427a