NY S09405 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - SIGNED CHAP.374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-05 - SIGNED CHAP.374
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "advanced building codes, appliance and equipment efficiency standards act"; adds the promotion of clean energy and the implementation of the climate agenda set forth in the New York state climate leadership and community protection act to the state energy conservation construction code; increases the efficiency standards of appliances and equipment by the state energy conservation construction code; increases the energy efficiency standards of appliances and equipment.
Title
Establishes the "advanced building codes, appliance and equipment efficiency standards act"; adds the promotion of clean energy and the implementation of the climate agenda set forth in the New York state climate leadership and community protection act to the state energy conservation construction code; increases the efficiency standards of appliances and equipment by the state energy conservation construction code; increases the energy efficiency standards of appliances and equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.374 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.514 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a10439 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1618 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10439 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s9405