NY S09382 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - APPROVAL MEMO.112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of general services to include requirements in any procurement for the manufacturing or retrofitting of zero emission vehicles and charging or fueling infrastructure that the components and parts used or supplied in the performance of the contract or any subcontract thereto shall be produced or made in whole or substantial part in the United States, its territories or possessions and that final assembly of the zero emission vehicles and charging or fueling infrastructure shall occur in the United States, its territories or possessions.
Title
Directs the commissioner of general services to include requirements in any procurement for the manufacturing or retrofitting of zero emission vehicles and charging or fueling infrastructure that the components and parts used or supplied in the performance of the contract or any subcontract thereto shall be produced or made in whole or substantial part in the United States, its territories or possessions and that final assembly of the zero emission vehicles and charging or fueling infrastructure shall occur in the United States, its territories or possessions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.112 |
2022-12-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.836 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.589 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a10450 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1792 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10450 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9382