NY S09351 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-06 - SIGNED CHAP.569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-06 - SIGNED CHAP.569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the dollar threshold for purchases from businesses certified as minority or women-owned that can be made without a formal competitive process.
Title
Increases the dollar threshold for purchases from businesses certified as minority or women-owned that can be made without a formal competitive process.
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.569 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.591 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a10459 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1486 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 |
Same As/Similar To
A10459 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9351