NY S09348 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the superintendent of financial services to study overdraft fees and prepare a report to be delivered to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.
Title
Directs the superintendent of financial services to study overdraft fees and prepare a report to be delivered to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.380 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.460 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted for a8292 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1602 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A08292 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - substituted by s9348