NY S09327 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city police pension fund to borrow from contributions.
Title
Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city police pension fund to borrow from contributions.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.173 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.748 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10360 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1721 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10360 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9327