NY S09293 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain allegations made by employees involving employment shall be protected and matters of public interest in actions involving public petition and participation.
Title
Provides that certain allegations made by employees involving employment shall be protected and matters of public interest in actions involving public petition and participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1718 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9293A |
2022-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10592 (Same As) 2022-07-06 - referred to judiciary