NY S09229 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.209
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - SIGNED CHAP.209
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of large capacity ammunition feeding device for purposes of the offense of criminal possession of a weapon in the third degree.
Title
Relates to the definition of large capacity ammunition feeding device for purposes of the offense of criminal possession of a weapon in the third degree.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.209 |
2022-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.644 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a10428a |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1869 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9229A |
2022-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10428 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s9229a