NY S09172 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the state aid for certain independent institutions of higher learning to the Leonard P. Stavisky student success grants; requires certain institutions and colleges to submit a report on the use of the state aid apportionment received including how it supported student success.
Title
Renames the state aid for certain independent institutions of higher learning to the Leonard P. Stavisky student success grants; requires certain institutions and colleges to submit a report on the use of the state aid apportionment received including how it supported student success.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1711 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10436 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - referred to higher education