NY S09152 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to participation in the banking development districts program.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to participation in the banking development districts program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.473 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.365 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a9804 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1402 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A09804 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - substituted by s9152