NY S09149 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - SIGNED CHAP.835
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - SIGNED CHAP.835
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that determinations by the workers' compensation board shall not be given collateral estoppel effect in any other action or proceeding arising out of the same occurrence, other than the determination of the existence of an employer employee relationship.
Title
Provides that determinations by the workers' compensation board shall not be given collateral estoppel effect in any other action or proceeding arising out of the same occurrence, other than the determination of the existence of an employer employee relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.835 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.747 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10349 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1914 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A10349 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9149