NY S09131 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10155A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10155A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides all local governments with the option to provide a property tax exemption to volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers.
Title
Provides all local governments with the option to provide a property tax exemption to volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10155A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1705 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10155 (Same As) 2022-12-09 - signed chap.670