NY S09065 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.666
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the Peconic Bay region community preservation funds; defines "disadvantaged communities"; provides that funds utilized for water quality improvement projects may be carried forward from year to year for utilization in future budgets and not less than ten percent of the annual proceeds of the fund shall be utilized to benefit disadvantaged communities; provides that management and stewardship funds may only be expended for projects related to lands acquired for open space preservation and historic preservation purposes; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the Peconic Bay region community preservation funds; defines "disadvantaged communities"; provides that funds utilized for water quality improvement projects may be carried forward from year to year for utilization in future budgets and not less than ten percent of the annual proceeds of the fund shall be utilized to benefit disadvantaged communities; provides that management and stewardship funds may only be expended for projects related to lands acquired for open space preservation and historic preservation purposes; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-21SenateSIGNED CHAP.666
2024-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2024-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.413
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a9943a
2024-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-03SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 9065A
2024-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1587
2024-05-30SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2024-04-16SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A09943 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9065a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback