NY S09051 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits investment of retirement funds in mortgages guaranteed by New York state homes and community renewal.
Title
Permits investment of retirement funds in mortgages guaranteed by New York state homes and community renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1261 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |