NY S09031 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the appointment of members of the Battery Park city authority; increases the number of members to nine; requires five of the nine members be primary residents of Battery Park city.
Title
Relates to the appointment of members of the Battery Park city authority; increases the number of members to nine; requires five of the nine members be primary residents of Battery Park city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.37 |
2022-11-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.749 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10371a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AMENDED 9031A |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1197 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10371 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9031a