NY S09028 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.599
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.599
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Greece, county of Monroe, the "Sergeant Gary Beikirch Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Greece, county of Monroe, the "Sergeant Gary Beikirch Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.599 |
2022-11-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.736 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10110 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1586 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10110 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9028