NY S08994 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.542
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the electronic submission of certificates of residence by community college enrollees; prohibits a community college chief fiscal officer from requiring a person desiring to enroll in a community college as a non-resident student to disclose or furnish his or her social security number.
Title
Provides for the electronic submission of certificates of residence by community college enrollees; prohibits a community college chief fiscal officer from requiring a person desiring to enroll in a community college as a non-resident student to disclose or furnish his or her social security number.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.542 |
2022-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.643 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10426 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8994A |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1251 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10426 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8994a