NY S08959 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to transfer of retirement membership for certain employees of SUNY within the professional, scientific and technical bargaining unit.
Title
Relates to transfer of retirement membership for certain employees of SUNY within the professional, scientific and technical bargaining unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.137 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.680 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a4460a |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1694 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04460 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8959