NY S08934 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9710
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9710
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of economic development, in conjunction with other departments and entities, to conduct a comprehensive study of public and private museums, including taking a census of public and private museums in the state, and to report the findings and recommendations of such study.
Title
Directs the department of economic development, in conjunction with other departments and entities, to conduct a comprehensive study of public and private museums, including taking a census of public and private museums in the state, and to report the findings and recommendations of such study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9710 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1690 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09710 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - tabled