NY S08895 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.718
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.718
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Mineola, county of Nassau, to alienate certain parklands for use in the village of Mineola public water supply system and replace such alienated parkland with a new, dedicated parkland.
Title
Authorizes the village of Mineola, county of Nassau, to alienate certain parklands for use in the village of Mineola public water supply system and replace such alienated parkland with a new, dedicated parkland.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.718 |
2022-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.572 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a10041a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1783 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8895A |
2022-05-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10041 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8895a