NY S08886 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for certain notices related to property/casualty insurance contracts under the workers' compensation law and the vehicle and traffic law to be delivered by electronic means.
Title
Allows for certain notices related to property/casualty insurance contracts under the workers' compensation law and the vehicle and traffic law to be delivered by electronic means.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1088 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09839 (Same As) 2022-04-19 - referred to insurance