NY S08871 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating the month of May as "Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month".
Title
Relates to designating the month of May as "Maternal Mental Health Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1230 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10622 (Same As) 2022-07-06 - referred to governmental operations