NY S08861 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.321
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system in the town of Newburgh as the "Gold Star Families Memorial Highway".
Title
Relates to designating a portion of the state highway system in the town of Newburgh as the "Gold Star Families Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.321 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.389 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a11033 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1688 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A11033 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8861