NY S08855 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - SIGNED CHAP.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - SIGNED CHAP.280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates state route 394 in the town of Ellicott, county of Chautauqua, as the "Sergeant James C. Matteson Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates state route 394 in the town of Ellicott, county of Chautauqua, as the "Sergeant James C. Matteson Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.280 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.461 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10976 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1686 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10976 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8855