NY S08850 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the eligibility of occupants of public housing authorities for rental assistance; authorizes occupants of public housing authorities to receive rental assistance at the same times as all other eligible populations.
Title
Relates to the eligibility of occupants of public housing authorities for rental assistance; authorizes occupants of public housing authorities to receive rental assistance at the same times as all other eligible populations.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Jabari Brisport [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1925 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09979 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - reported referred to ways and means