NY S08806 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an electronic personal voter registration process integrated within designated agency applications; requires the state board of elections to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes an electronic personal voter registration process integrated within designated agency applications; requires the state board of elections to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Gianaris [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.54 |
2020-12-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.350 |
2020-12-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.322 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a8280c |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.970 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08280 (Same As) 2020-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.54