NY S08803 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limitations on local indebtedness; removes school districts from those not permitted to contract indebtedness.
Title
Relates to limitations on local indebtedness; removes school districts from those not permitted to contract indebtedness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.631 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9988 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1184 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-04-29 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-04-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09988 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8803