NY S08793 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9675A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9675A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing occupancy of joint living-work quarters for artists in certain manufacturing buildings converted to joint living-work quarters whose residence therein began on or before December 15, 2021.
Title
Relates to allowing occupancy of joint living-work quarters for artists in certain manufacturing buildings converted to joint living-work quarters whose residence therein began on or before December 15, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9675A |
2022-05-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8793A |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1033 |
2022-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09675 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - signed chap.420