NY S08783 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - signed chap.138
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - signed chap.138
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requests for absentee ballots; when they may be received.
Title
Relates to requests for absentee ballots; when they may be received.
Sponsors
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | signed chap.138 |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.964 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8783A |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.219 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | rules report cal.219 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-15 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10807 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.964 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8783A |
2020-07-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ELECTIONS |
2020-07-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10807 (Same As) 2020-08-20 - signed chap.138