NY S08780 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fees for gift cards; limits the amount a merchant may charge for the gift card; and prohibits the expiration of such gift cards.
Title
Relates to fees for gift cards; limits the amount a merchant may charge for the gift card; and prohibits the expiration of such gift cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.961 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-07-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |