NY S08757 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Webster, county of Monroe, to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands for use by the Webster central school district for the purpose of using such parcel in conjunction with the sports field already purchased for the benefits of the students of such school district.
Title
Authorizes the town of Webster, county of Monroe, to alienate certain lands used as parkland and to dedicate certain other lands as parklands for use by the Webster central school district for the purpose of using such parcel in conjunction with the sports field already purchased for the benefits of the students of such school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.635 |
2022-11-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.636 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a10106 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-31 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1676 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10106 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8757