NY S08745 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3580A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3580A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the social services department to terminate the subsidies that may be provided to a parent who adopts a disabled or hard to place child under certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes the social services department to terminate the subsidies that may be provided to a parent who adopts a disabled or hard to place child under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3580A |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.930 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03580 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY