NY S08724 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "safe landings for youth leaving foster care act" or "safe landings act", which provides protections for youth transitioning out of foster care who bring certain legal proceedings.
Title
Relates to enacting the "safe landings for youth leaving foster care act" or "safe landings act", which provides protections for youth transitioning out of foster care who bring certain legal proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.458 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a9321b |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8724B |
2024-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 8724A |
2024-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.929 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09321 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8724b