NY S08689 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.631
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Gurudwara Shaheedan, Inc. with respect to the 2019-2020 assessment roll for a portion of the 2020 general taxes and the 2020-2021 assessment roll for all of the 2020-2021 school taxes and all of the 2021 general taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Gurudwara Shaheedan, Inc. with respect to the 2019-2020 assessment roll for a portion of the 2020 general taxes and the 2020-2021 assessment roll for all of the 2020-2021 school taxes and all of the 2021 general taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-11-22SenateSIGNED CHAP.631
2022-11-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2022-06-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2022-06-03Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.716
2022-06-03Assemblysubstituted for a9792b
2022-06-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2022-06-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-05-31SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1673
2022-05-31SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2022-05-19SenatePRINT NUMBER 8689B
2022-05-19SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2022-05-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 8689A
2022-05-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2022-03-30SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A09792 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8689b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S8689
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08689&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08689
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08689&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08689A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08689&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S08689B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S8689#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S8689#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S08689&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback