NY S08673 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions of law relating to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Livingston from December 1, 2022 to December 1, 2025.
Title
Extends the provisions of law relating to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Livingston from December 1, 2022 to December 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.454 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.715 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a9790 |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.961 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09790 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8673