NY S08658 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.335
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the submission date for a report relating to volunteer firefighter recruitment and retention and to the effectiveness of certain provisions relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the submission date for a report relating to volunteer firefighter recruitment and retention and to the effectiveness of certain provisions relating thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-30SenateSIGNED CHAP.335
2022-06-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2022-05-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-05-10Assemblypassed assembly
2022-05-10Assemblyordered to third reading cal.630
2022-05-10Assemblysubstituted for a9597
2022-03-31Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2022-03-31SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-03-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-03-31SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.743
2022-03-28SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09597 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - substituted by s8658

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback